+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On July 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Substituted By A7646a
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.888
On July 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Rules
On July 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Print Number 6144a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Local Government
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
On January 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Local Governments
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1827
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
+ − Votes (4)
July 22, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 19
July 20, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Local Government)
- Yeas: 7
June 20, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 19
June 20, 2019: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor