+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On June 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committed to rules
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Advanced to third reading
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- 2nd report cal.
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- 1st report cal.121
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to local government
+ − Vote
February 4, 2014: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Local Government - Feb 4, 2014
- Yeas: 9
Details:
+
−
- Greg Ball: yea
- Phil Boyle: yea
- Terry Gipson: yea
- George Latimer: yea
- Kathleen A. Marchione: yea
- Jack M. Martins: yea
- Ted O'Brien: yea
- Patty Ritchie: yea
- David J. Valesky: yea
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor