+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On August 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.262
On August 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.508
- Substituted For A7773a
On June 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1964
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On June 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Print Number 6110b
- Amend And Recommit To Local Government
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Print Number 6110a
- Amend And Recommit To Local Government
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
+ − Votes (2)
June 19, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 25
June 19, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor