+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On April 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.482
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Investigations And Government Operations
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Print Number 6083a
- Amend And Recommit To Investigations And Government Operations
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Investigations And Government Operations
+ − Votes (2)
April 30, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
February 13, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Investigations And Government Operations)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor