+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Social Services
On May 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading (t) 6079b
On January 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On January 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.210
On January 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Died In Assembly
- Returned To Senate
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Social Services
On June 3, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Social Services
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1455
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Print Number 6079a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Social Services
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Social Services
+ − Votes (4)
May 24, 2022: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 2
January 18, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Social Services)
- Yeas: 7
June 3, 2021: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 2
June 2, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor