+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On September 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.322
On September 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On June 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.409
- Substituted For A7842
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1160
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
+ − Votes (2)
June 19, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
May 23, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Health)
- Yeas: 17
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor