+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On September 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.368
On September 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.796
- Substituted For A8549
On June 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.901
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
On October 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (2)
June 1, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Present/NV: 3
May 17, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Transportation)
- Yeas: 17
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor