+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On May 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1290
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Energy And Telecommunications
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Energy And Telecommunications
+ − Vote
May 16, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Energy And Telecommunications)
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor