+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Print Number 6046c
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Cities
On April 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Cities
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
On June 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Print Number 6046b
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Transportation
On June 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Print Number 6046a
- Amend And Recommit To Transportation
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
+ − Sponsors (37)
Type:
Primary Sponsor