+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On July 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.219
On June 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On May 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Home Rule Request
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.134
- Substituted For A7033a
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Home Rule Request
- Passed Senate
- Delivered To Assembly
On May 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Local Governments
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.954
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Print Number 6046b
- Amend And Recommit To Local Government
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Print Number 6046a
- Amend And Recommit To Local Government
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
+ − Votes (2)
May 24, 2021: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
May 10, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Local Government)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor