+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On July 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.172
On July 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 8, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.56
- Substituted For A8414a
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate
- Delivered To Assembly
On February 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Real Property Taxation
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
- Amended (t) 6044b
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.172
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
On November 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Print Number 6044a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Rules
On September 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (2)
February 29, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 4
February 9, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Local Government)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor