+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On June 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On June 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1430
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Consumer Protection
On November 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Print Number 6030b
- Amend And Recommit To Consumer Protection
On June 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Print Number 6030a
- Amend And Recommit To Consumer Protection
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Consumer Protection
+ − Vote
May 31, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Consumer Protection)
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor