+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Print Number 6025a
- Amend And Recommit To Local Government
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
On January 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Real Property Taxation
On June 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1579
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
+ − Votes (3)
June 18, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 2
June 18, 2019: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 16
May 29, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Local Government)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor