+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On July 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.171
On July 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.795
- Substituted For A8335a
On May 9, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Real Property Taxation
On May 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.328
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Print Number 6020a
- Amend And Recommit To Local Government
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
On July 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (2)
May 9, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 8
- Absent: 1
March 8, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Local Government)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor