+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On December 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approval Memo.144
- Signed Chap.791
On December 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.132
- Substituted For A6562a
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
On June 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading 6018b
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1287
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Print Number 6018a
- Amend And Recommit To Environmental Conservation
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
+ − Votes (2)
June 7, 2021: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 4
May 24, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor