+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On December 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.392
- Substituted For A1338c
On May 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On May 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Amended 5994c
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
- Amended 5994b
On May 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1216
On May 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On March 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Print Number 5994a
- Amend And Recommit To Labor
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Labor
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Labor
+ − Votes (2)
May 31, 2022: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 10
May 10, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Finance)
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor