+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 11, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to transportation
On June 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Delivered to assembly
- Passed senate
On May 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Advanced to third reading
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- 2nd report cal.
- Amended 5969a
On May 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- 1st report cal.513
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to transportation
On October 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to rules
+ − Votes (2)
June 11, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: - Jun 11, 2014
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
Details:
+
−
- Joseph P. Addabbo Jr.: yea
- Tony Avella: yea
- Greg Ball: yea
- John J. Bonacic: yea
- Phil Boyle: yea
- Neil D. Breslin: yea
- David Carlucci: yea
- John A. DeFrancisco: yea
- Ruben Diaz: yea
- Martin Malavé Dilan: yea
- Adriano Espaillat: present
- Hugh T. Farley: yea
- Simcha Felder: yea
- John J. Flanagan: yea
- Patrick M. Gallivan: yea
- Michael Gianaris: yea
- Terry Gipson: yea
- Martin J. Golden: yea
- Joseph A. Griffo: yea
- Mark Grisanti: yea
- Kemp Hannon: yea
- Ruth Hassell-Thompson: present
- Brad Hoylman-Sigal: yea
- Timothy M. Kennedy: yea
- Jeffrey D. Klein: yea
- Liz Krueger: yea
- Andrew J. Lanza: yea
- William J. Larkin Jr.: yea
- George Latimer: yea
- Kenneth P. LaValle: yea
- Tom Libous: yea
- Elizabeth Little: yea
- Carl L Marcellino: yea
- Kathleen A. Marchione: yea
- Jack M. Martins: yea
- George D. Maziarz: yea
- Velmanette Montgomery: yea
- Michael F. Nozzolio: yea
- Ted O'Brien: yea
- Thomas F. O'Mara: yea
- Kevin S. Parker: yea
- José Peralta: yea
- Bill Perkins: nay
- Michael H. Ranzenhofer: yea
- Patty Ritchie: yea
- Gustavo Rivera: yea
- Joseph E. Robach: yea
- John L. Sampson: yea
- James Sanders Jr.: yea
- Diane J. Savino: yea
- Jose M. Serrano: yea
- James L. Seward: yea
- Dean G. Skelos: yea
- Malcolm A. Smith: present
- Daniel L. Squadron: yea
- Toby Ann Stavisky: yea
- Andrea Stewart-Cousins: yea
- Cecilia Tkaczyk: yea
- David J. Valesky: yea
- Catharine Young: yea
- Lee M. Zeldin: yea
May 6, 2014: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Transportation - May 6, 2014
- Yeas: 19
Details:
+
−
- Tony Avella: yea
- David Carlucci: yea
- Ruben Diaz: yea
- Martin Malavé Dilan: yea
- Patrick M. Gallivan: yea
- Terry Gipson: yea
- Timothy M. Kennedy: yea
- William J. Larkin Jr.: yea
- Carl L Marcellino: yea
- George D. Maziarz: yea
- Michael F. Nozzolio: yea
- Thomas F. O'Mara: yea
- Bill Perkins: yea
- Michael H. Ranzenhofer: yea
- Joseph E. Robach: yea
- Daniel L. Squadron: yea
- Toby Ann Stavisky: yea
- Catharine Young: yea
- Lee M. Zeldin: yea
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor