+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On November 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.304
On November 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On July 23, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.210
- Substituted For A5605c
On July 22, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On July 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On July 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.788
- Reported And Committed To Rules
On July 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Print Number 5959d
- Amend And Recommit To Finance
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Print Number 5959c
- Amend And Recommit To Judiciary
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary
On June 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Print Number 5959b
- Amend And Recommit To Judiciary
On June 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Print Number 5959a
- Amend And Recommit To Judiciary
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Judiciary
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Codes
+ − Votes (4)
July 22, 2020: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
July 21, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Finance)
- Yeas: 23
July 21, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 19
March 10, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Judiciary)
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 1