+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On August 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.104
On August 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.633
- Substituted For A8235
On June 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1794
On June 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (2)
June 17, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 25
June 17, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor