+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Print Number 5955b
- Amend And Recommit To Consumer Protection
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Print Number 5955a
- Amend And Recommit To Consumer Protection
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Consumer Protection
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1001
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Consumer Protection
+ − Vote
May 16, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Consumer Protection)
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor