+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On December 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approval Memo.19
On December 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.557
On November 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.588
- Substituted For A8058b
On June 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Economic Development
On June 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1648
On June 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (2)
June 16, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 25
June 16, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor