+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On August 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.407
On August 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.463
- Substituted For A7163
On June 3, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
- Amended (t) 5945a
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1175
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Mental Health
+ − Votes (2)
June 3, 2021: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
May 19, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Mental Health)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor