+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On April 26, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Operations
On April 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.510
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Social Services
On January 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 3, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Operations
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1181
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Social Services
+ − Votes (4)
April 26, 2022: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
February 15, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Social Services)
- Yeas: 7
June 3, 2021: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
May 19, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Social Services)
- Yeas: 7