+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On December 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approval Memo.59
- Signed Chap.493
On December 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 14, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.245
- Substituted For A7726a
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1656
On June 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Rules
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Print Number 5929a
- Amend And Recommit To Children And Families
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Children And Families
+ − Votes (3)
June 14, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 25
June 14, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 1
June 6, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Children And Families)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor