+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On June 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Transportation
On June 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1621
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On January 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Print Number 5842b
- Amend And Recommit To Transportation
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
On October 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Print Number 5842a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Rules
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (2)
June 14, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 2
June 9, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor