+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On January 31, 2024 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On January 30, 2024 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 29, 2024 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.243
On January 3, 2024 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
On March 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
+ − Vote
January 29, 2024: Committee Vote (Senate Local Government)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor