+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On May 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1137
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Banks
On June 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Rules
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Banks
+ − Votes (2)
May 9, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Banks)
- Yeas: 19
June 7, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Banks)
- Yeas: 19
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor