+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On November 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.513
On November 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Home Rule Request
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.584
- Substituted For A7955a
On June 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Home Rule Request
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1792
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Print Number 5808a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Local Government
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
+ − Votes (2)
June 17, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 25
June 17, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor