+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On December 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.514
On December 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 8, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.53
- Substituted For A7675a
On May 24, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Education
On May 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading 5795a
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.225
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Education
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 25, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Education
On June 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1897
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Education
+ − Votes (4)
May 24, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 4
February 24, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Education)
- Yeas: 19
June 25, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 23
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
June 25, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor