+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On June 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Repassed Senate
On June 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading (t) 5792b
- Vote Reconsidered - Restored To Third Reading
On June 8, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
On June 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recalled From Assembly
On May 3, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.502
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Print Number 5792a
- Amend And Recommit To Codes
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Codes
On June 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommitted To Rules
On June 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1590
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Codes
+ − Votes (4)
June 16, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
May 3, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Present/NV: 3
March 28, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Codes)
- Yeas: 16
June 15, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 25
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor