+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On June 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Higher Education
On June 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On June 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On June 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1320
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Higher Education
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Higher Education
+ − Votes (2)
June 15, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
June 1, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Higher Education)
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor