+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On December 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.606
- Approval Memo.31
On November 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.517
- Substituted For A7811a
On June 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions
On June 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading (t) 5782a
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.888
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Energy And Telecommunications
+ − Votes (2)
June 18, 2019: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 4
May 22, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Energy And Telecommunications)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3