+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On September 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.354
On September 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Home Rule Request
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.686
- Substituted For A7979
On June 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Home Rule Request
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1644
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Civil Service And Pensions
+ − Votes (2)
June 16, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 25
June 16, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor