+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.163
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Civil Service And Pensions
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On June 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading 5778a
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1344
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Civil Service And Pensions
+ − Votes (2)
January 16, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Civil Service And Pensions)
- Yeas: 11
May 23, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Civil Service And Pensions)
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor