+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs
On January 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 3, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Operations
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1252
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs
+ − Votes (2)
June 3, 2021: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
May 19, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor