+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On December 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.580
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Consumer Protection
On January 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Print Number 5771a
- Amend And Recommit To Consumer Protection
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Consumer Protection
+ − Vote
March 4, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Consumer Protection)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2