+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On August 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.360
On July 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.171
- Substituted For A3942
- Referred To Insurance
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1164
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Insurance
+ − Votes (2)
June 1, 2021: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
May 18, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Insurance)
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor