+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On September 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.303
- Delivered To Governor
On June 17, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.184
- Substituted For A7690
On June 5, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On June 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.913
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Agriculture
+ − Votes (2)
June 5, 2019: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
May 29, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Agriculture)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor