+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Print Number 5744b
- Amend And Recommit To Finance
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Budget And Revenue
On May 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Print Number 5744a
- Amend And Recommit To Budget And Revenue
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Budget And Revenue
+ − Vote
March 3, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Budget And Revenue)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor