+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On December 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Vetoed Memo.232
On December 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.440
- Substituted For A6295
On June 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1760
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Investigations And Government Operations
+ − Votes (2)
June 15, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Present/NV: 3
June 14, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 24
- Absent: 1