+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On September 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.348
On September 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 25, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Home Rule Request
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.426
- Substituted For A7910a
On June 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1862
On May 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (2)
June 18, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 25
June 18, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsor
Rules
Type:
Primary Sponsor