+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On December 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On January 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On January 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.148
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary
+ − Vote
January 14, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Judiciary)
- Yeas: 15
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor