+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On November 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Vetoed Memo.199
On November 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Home Rule Request
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.339
- Substituted For A7127
On June 14, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Home Rule Request
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1341
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Civil Service And Pensions
+ − Votes (2)
June 14, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
May 23, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Civil Service And Pensions)
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor