+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On December 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.711
On December 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Home Rule Request
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.654
- Substituted For A7715b
On June 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1779
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On June 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Print Number 5698a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Local Government
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
+ − Votes (2)
June 19, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 2
June 19, 2019: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 12
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor