+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Substituted By A4522a
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1227
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Print Number 5675a
- Amend And Recommit To Health
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
+ − Vote
May 19, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Health)
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor