+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On June 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Higher Education
On June 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On June 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1494
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Health
On June 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1149
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
+ − Votes (4)
June 12, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 2
May 31, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Health)
- Yeas: 17
June 13, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
May 23, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Health)
- Yeas: 17