+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On June 8, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Economic Development
On June 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.163
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Commerce, Economic Development And Small Business
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Commerce, Economic Development And Small Business
+ − Votes (2)
June 8, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Present/NV: 3
February 9, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Commerce, Economic Development And Small Business)
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor