+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On December 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.590
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Print Number 5651a
- Amend And Recommit To Judiciary
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On June 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On June 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1069
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary
+ − Votes (2)
March 10, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Judiciary)
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
May 30, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Judiciary)
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor