+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On September 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.302
- Delivered To Governor
On June 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.518
- Substituted For A7824a
On June 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Real Property Taxation
On June 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading (t) 5647b
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading 5647a
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.802
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
+ − Votes (2)
June 14, 2019: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 3
May 20, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Local Government)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor