+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Substituted By A8165a
On June 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1554
On June 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Rules
On June 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Print Number 5637a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Finance
On May 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Transportation
On June 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1578
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
+ − Votes (6)
June 8, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 24
- Present/NV: 1
June 7, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Finance)
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 1
May 24, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Transportation)
- Yeas: 17
- Present/NV: 2
June 15, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 1
June 15, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
June 2, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Transportation)
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 1